Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão

Dioecesis Palmensis-Beltranensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 7 January 1987
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Cascavel
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Parana
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 17,964 (6,938 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul 2
  • Mailing Address: Rua Bispo Dom Carlos 819, C.P. 50, 85555-000 Palmas, PR, Brazil
  • Telephone: (046) 263-1134
  • Fax: 262-1511

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Palmas
9 December 1933ErectedDiocese of Lages
Diocese of Ponta Grossa
Territorial Prelature of Palmas (erected)
14 January 1958Territory LostDiocese of Lages
Territorial Prelature of Palmas
Diocese of Chapecó (erected)
Diocese of Palmas
14 January 1958ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Palmas Diocese of Palmas
Diocese of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão
7 January 1987Name ChangedDiocese of Palmas Diocese of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Palmas
1950126,900137,63092.2%320235,517223611ap1951
Diocese of Palmas
1966339,340379,69489.4%1435496,9253612527ap1967
1968470,000520,00090.4%7384510,444385029ap1971
1976553,500635,50087.1%1658747,4798014034ap1977
1980596,000709,00084.1%1261738,1649415638ap1981
Diocese of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão
1990557,000632,00088.1%2350737,63010015839ap1991
1999507,000562,00090.2%2650766,671215516041ap2000
2000513,000569,00090.2%2553786,576314413441ap2001
2001484,680557,10387.0%2653796,13539913342ap2002
2002487,743557,10387.5%2753806,09649911343ap2003
2003487,448557,44387.4%2849776,330211311343ap2004
2004490,787557,70788.0%3048786,292611011543ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.9, 28 May 2012; data: 7 Jun 2012