Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Geremias Steinmetz

Archbishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1965 Born
9 Feb 199125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão, Parana, Brazil
5 Jan 201145.8AppointedBishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
25 Mar 201146.0Ordained BishopBishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
14 Jun 201752.3AppointedArchbishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geremias Steinmetz
Archbishop Geremias Steinmetz (born ) Archbishop of Londrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSulina, Diocese of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão, Parana

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Londrina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,973
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Jun 2017