Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nélio Domingos Zortea

Bishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1963 Born
12 Oct 199531.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil
18 Nov 201551.9AppointedBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
30 Jan 201652.1Ordained BishopBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
13 Feb 201652.1InstalledBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Nélio Domingos Zortea
Bishop Nélio Domingos Zortea (born ) Bishop of Jataí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIraí

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jataí.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2015
  • ob: CB, 30 Nov 2015
  • i: CB, 3 Dec 2015
  • c2+: CB, 12 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,806

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast