Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amilton Manoel da Silva, C.P.

Auxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Tusuros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1963 Born
18 Jan 199733.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
17 Dec 200037.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
7 Jun 201754.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
7 Jun 201754.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tusuros
19 Aug 201754.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tusuros

MicroData Summary for Amilton Manoel da Silva
Bishop Amilton Manoel da Silva C.P. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Curitiba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsvaldo Cruz, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais
Ordained PriestOsvaldo Cruz, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopSão José, Church, Osvaldo Cruz, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Curitiba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2017
  • c1/ob: CB, 7 Jun 2017
  • c2: CB, 15 Jun 2017
  • c34: CB, 20 Jun 2017
  • c3: CB, 19 Aug 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,501

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018