Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gian Carlo Perego

Archbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1960 Born
23 Jun 198423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cremona, Italy
15 Feb 201756.2AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy
6 May 201756.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy
3 Jun 201756.5InstalledArchbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gian Carlo Perego (VIAF: 194658096)
Archbishop Gian Carlo Perego (born ) Archbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVailate, Diocese of Cremona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cremona, Diocese of Cremona

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ferrara-Comacchio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2017
  • ob: CB, 23 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017