Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Rocco Pennacchio

Archbishop-Elect of Fermo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1963 Born
4 Jul 199835.0Ordained PriestPriest of Matera-Irsina, Italy
14 Sep 201754.2AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
25 Nov 201754.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
2 Dec 201754.4InstalledArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rocco Pennacchio
Father Rocco Pennacchio (born ) Archbishop-Elect of Fermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMatera, Archdiocese of Matera
Ordained BishopMatera, Archdiocese of Matera-Irsina

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Fermo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2017
  • ob/i: CB, 24 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 29 Sep 2017