Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Giuseppe Caiazzo

Archbishop of Matera-Irsina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1956 Born
10 Oct 198125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
12 Feb 201659.8AppointedArchbishop of Matera-Irsina, Italy
2 Apr 201659.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Matera-Irsina, Italy
16 Apr 201660.0InstalledArchbishop of Matera-Irsina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Giuseppe Caiazzo
Archbishop Antonio Giuseppe Caiazzo (born ) Archbishop of Matera-Irsina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsola Capo Rizzuto, Diocese of Crotone (Cotrone)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Matera-Irsina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2016
  • ob: CB, 24 Feb 2016
  • c2+: CB, 3 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 14 Nov 2017