Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Maurício da Rocha

Deceased

Bishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1885BornMaceió
29 Jun 190823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Maceió, Brazil
10 Mar 191933.7AppointedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
20 Jul 191934.1Ordained BishopBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
4 Feb 192741.6AppointedBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Jun 192742.0InstalledBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 Nov 196984.4DiedBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Maurício da Rocha:
Bishop José Maurício da Rocha (born , died ) Bishop of Bragança Paulista

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 50.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013