Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leon Wałęga

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów

Titular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1859BornMoszczenica
24 Mar 188324.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 190142.1AppointedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
12 May 190142.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tarnów, Poland
4 May 193273.1ResignedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
4 May 193273.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
27 Jan 193373.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus
22 Apr 193374.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarnów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Leon Wałęga:
Archbishop Leon Wałęga (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 20 May 2011
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 536
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013