Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Władysław Bobowski

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów, Poland

Titular Bishop of Abernethia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1932 Born
23 Jun 195725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
23 Dec 197442.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
23 Dec 197442.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Abernethia
2 Feb 197542.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abernethia
20 Oct 200977.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Władysław Bobowski
Bishop Władysław Bobowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTropie
Ordained BishopNativity of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral, Tarnów, Diocese of Tarnów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tarnów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 32, Number 1,822

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast