Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierantonio Pavanello

Bishop of Adria-Rovigo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1955 Born
16 May 198226.9Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
23 Dec 201560.5AppointedBishop of Adria-Rovigo, Italy
20 Feb 201660.7Ordained BishopBishop of Adria-Rovigo, Italy
6 Mar 201660.7InstalledBishop of Adria-Rovigo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pierantonio Pavanello
Bishop Pierantonio Pavanello (born ) Bishop of Adria-Rovigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBassano del Grappa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Adria-Rovigo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2015
  • ob/i/c2: CB, 10 Jan 2016
  • c34: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,845

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast