Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri-Martin-Félix Jenny

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1904BornTourcoing
10 Jul 192723.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 195954.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France
14 Mar 195954.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycaonia
18 May 195954.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycaonia
15 May 196560.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cambrai, France
15 May 196560.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Saldae
15 Feb 196661.6SucceededArchbishop of Cambrai, France
25 Mar 198075.7RetiredArchbishop of Cambrai, France
8 Mar 198277.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Martin-Félix Jenny:
Archbishop Henri-Martin-Félix Jenny (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cambrai

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013