Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel-Joseph de Cosnac

Deceased

Bishop of Die


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1700BornCosnac
18 Dec 172323.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 173433.5SelectedBishop of Die, France
27 Sep 173433.9ConfirmedBishop of Die, France
24 Oct 173433.9Ordained BishopBishop of Die, France
22 Aug 174140.8DiedBishop of Die, France

MicroData Summary for Daniel-Joseph de Cosnac:
Bishop Daniel-Joseph de Cosnac (born , died ) Bishop of Die

  • a priest for 17.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015