Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Pallikaparampil

Bishop Emeritus of Palai (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1927 BornMutholapuram
23 Nov 195831.6Ordained PriestPriest of Palai (Syro-Malabarese), India
16 Jun 197346.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palai (Syro-Malabarese), India
16 Jun 197346.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
15 Aug 197346.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abydus
6 Feb 198153.8AppointedBishop of Palai (Syro-Malabarese), India
18 Mar 200476.9RetiredBishop of Palai (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Pallikaparampil:
Bishop Joseph Pallikaparampil (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Palai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palai (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 31 Jul 2014