Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Kocherry

Apostolic Nuncio to Bangladesh

Titular Archbishop of Othona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1945 Born
26 Jun 197429.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 200055.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Othona
10 Jun 200055.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ghana
10 Jun 200055.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Togo
21 Aug 200055.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Othona
200256.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Togo
22 Dec 200762.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Zimbabwe
6 Jul 201368.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for George Kocherry
Archbishop George Kocherry (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Bangladesh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChanganacherry, India

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Bangladesh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,824
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast