Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Vadakel, M.S.T.A.

Bishop of Ujjain (Syro-Malabarese)

Note/Previous Titular See: (Soc. Miss. di S. Tommaso Apostolo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1952 BornVilakumadam
9 Apr 197926.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Apr 199845.5AppointedBishop of Ujjain (Syro-Malabarese), India
8 Sep 199845.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ujjain (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Vadakel:
Bishop Sebastian Vadakel M.S.T.A. (born ) Bishop of Ujjain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ujjain (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013