Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacob Muricken

Auxiliary Bishop of Palai (Syro-Malabar), India

Titular Bishop of Thinis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1963 Born
27 Dec 199330.5Ordained PriestPriest of Palai (Syro-Malabar), India
24 Aug 201249.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palai (Syro-Malabar), India
24 Aug 201249.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thinis
1 Oct 201249.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thinis

MicroData Summary for Jacob Muricken
Bishop Jacob Muricken (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Palai

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palai (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2012
  • ob: CB, 7 Sep 2012
  • c2+: CB, 28 Sep 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,548

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast