Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar)

Tellicherriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • George Njaralakatt, Archbishop
  • George Valiamattam, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Eparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar)
31 December 1953ErectedDiocese of Calicut Eparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
1 March 1973Territory LostEparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar) Eparchy of Mananthavady (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
28 April 1986Territory LostEparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar) Diocese of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
Archeparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar)
18 May 1995ElevatedEparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar) Archeparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar)
24 April 1999Territory LostArcheparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar) Diocese of Belthangady (Syro-Malabar) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Eparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar)
1970263,63512,000,0002.2%190522421,08974530151ap1971
1980289,042182432251,284561,050209ap1981
1990247,2342,715,0009.1%156301861,32937815195ap1991
Archeparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar)
1999306,2563,500,0008.8%212842961,0341741,806232ap2000
2000289,5623,550,0008.2%187772641,0961651,291189ap2001
2001295,2003,600,0008.2%202652671,1051541,588189ap2002
2002285,1263,605,0007.9%201732741,0401971,656201ap2003
2003278,8043,605,0007.7%199692681,0401681,392207ap2004
2004279,2003,650,0007.6%210742849831481,415213ap2005
2009307,5003,758,0008.2%2511303818073532,032233ap2010
2010307,6823,810,0008.1%2761254017673321,936234ap2011
2014302,0073,550,0008.5%2801444247124301,752245ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 3 Jun 2015