Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Doaninoel, S.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Honiara, Solomon Islands

Titular Bishop of Girus Tarasii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1950Born
2 Feb 197423.9ProfessedMember of Society of Mary
20 Dec 198030.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
6 Dec 200757.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea
6 Dec 200757.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Girus Tarasii
8 Mar 200858.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Girus Tarasii
9 Jun 201161.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Honiara, Solomon Islands
7 Aug 201868.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Honiara, Solomon Islands

MicroData Summary for John Doaninoel
Bishop John Doaninoel S.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Honiara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTimputz
Ordained BishopVunapope
Death PlaceHoniara, Archdiocese of Honiara
Buried Place (Original)Visale, Cemetery, Honiara, Archdiocese of Honiara

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,685
  • d: CB, 7 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Aug 2018

Quantcast