Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prosper Balthazar Lyimo

Auxiliary Bishop of Arusha, Tanzania

Titular Bishop of Vanariona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1964 Born
4 Jul 199732.8Ordained PriestPriest of Arusha, Tanzania
11 Nov 201450.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Arusha, Tanzania
11 Nov 201450.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vanariona
15 Feb 201550.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vanariona

MicroData Summary for Prosper Balthazar Lyimo
Bishop Prosper Balthazar Lyimo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Arusha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKyou-Kilema

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Arusha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 27 Nov 2014
  • c2+: CB, 12 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast