Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luciano Capelli, S.D.B.

Bishop of Gizo, Solomon Islands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1947 Born
196517.2ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Jun 197527.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
5 Jun 200759.6AppointedBishop of Gizo, Solomon Islands
21 Oct 200760.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gizo, Solomon Islands

MicroData Summary for Luciano Capelli
Bishop Luciano Capelli S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Gizo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCologna di Tirano, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gizo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,556

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast