Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Fada N’Gourma

Dioecesis Fada Ngurmaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Pierre Claver Malgo, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 16 June 1964
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Koupéla
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Burkina Faso
  • Square Kilometers: 47,681 (18,416 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 12, Fada N'Gourma, Burkina Faso
  • Telephone: 40.77.01.33
  • Fax: 40.77.04.96

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Fada N’Gourma
12 February 1959ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Niamey Prefecture Apostolic of Fada N’Gourma (erected)
Diocese of Fada N’Gourma
16 June 1964ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Fada N’Gourma Diocese of Fada N’Gourma
20 November 2004Territory LostDiocese of Fada N’Gourma
Diocese of Ouahigouya
Diocese of Dori (erected)
11 February 2012Territory LostDiocese of Fada N’Gourma
Archdiocese of Koupéla
Diocese of Tenkodogo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Fada N’Gourma
19707,558423,3001.8%212135925519ap1971
198012,025545,4142.2%51722546234612ap1981
199025,2371,124,9542.2%81826970276312ap1991
199943,0001,429,1703.0%1517321,343267713ap2000
200047,2871,472,0453.2%2217391,212299113ap2001
200148,7101,516,0003.2%1915341,432279213ap2002
200252,7301,590,7593.3%2515401,318279213ap2003
200352,7301,590,5793.3%2415391,352279214ap2004
200452,7301,590,5793.3%2912411,286249214ap2005
200650,9691,161,0004.4%377441,158229011ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013