Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Modeste Kambou

Bishop of Gaoua, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1963 Born
28 Dec 199128.0Ordained PriestPriest of Diébougou, Burkina Faso
30 Nov 201147.9AppointedBishop of Gaoua, Burkina Faso
18 Feb 201248.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gaoua, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Modeste Kambou
Bishop Modeste Kambou (born ) Bishop of Gaoua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBouti

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gaoua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 26 Dec 2011
  • ob: CB, 16 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast