Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prosper Bonaventure Ky

Bishop of Dédougou, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1965 Born
23 Jul 199429.5Ordained PriestPriest of Nouna-Dédougou, Burkina Faso
24 Apr 201853.2AppointedBishop of Dédougou, Burkina Faso
21 Jul 201853.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dédougou, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Prosper Bonaventure Ky (VIAF: 283387716)
Bishop Prosper Bonaventure Ky (born ) Bishop of Dédougou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToma, Diocese of Nouna
Ordained BishopSainte Anne, Cathedral, Dédougou, Diocese of Dédougou

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dédougou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2018
  • ob: CB, 30 May 2018
  • ob: CB, 14 Jul 2018
  • c2+: CB, 19 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast