Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Claver Malgo

Bishop of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1954 Born
7 Jul 198429.8Ordained PriestPriest of Koupéla, Burkina Faso
11 Feb 201257.4AppointedBishop of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso
12 May 201257.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Pierre Claver Malgo
Bishop Pierre Claver Malgo (born ) Bishop of Fada N’Gourma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDimistènga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fada N’Gourma.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2012
  • ob: CB, 10 May 2012
  • c2+: CB, 13 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,432

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast