Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Patrick Carroll

Deceased

Bishop of Helena, Montana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1864BornDubuque, IA
7 Jul 188925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
12 Sep 190440.5AppointedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
21 Dec 190440.8Ordained BishopBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
4 Nov 192561.7DiedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA

MicroData Summary for John Patrick Carroll:
Bishop John Patrick Carroll (born , died ) Bishop of Helena

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015