Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund John Aloysius Gleeson, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Maitland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1869BornRathelong, Ireland
18 Jun 189324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Maitland, Australia
8 Jul 190536.5ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
31 May 192960.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Maitland, Australia
31 May 192960.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Vatarba
15 Sep 192960.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vatarba
28 Mar 193162.2SucceededBishop of Maitland, Australia
4 Mar 195687.1DiedBishop of Maitland, Australia

MicroData Summary for Edmund John Aloysius Gleeson:
Bishop Edmund John Aloysius Gleeson C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Maitland

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013