Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Carroll

Deceased

Bishop of Lismore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1865BornBresnor, Piltown, Ireland
31 May 189024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ossory, Ireland
2 Dec 190943.9AppointedBishop of Lismore, Australia
6 Mar 191044.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lismore, Australia
8 May 194983.4DiedBishop of Lismore, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Carroll:
Bishop John Joseph Carroll (born , died ) Bishop of Lismore

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014