Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Miguel Cardinal Obando Bravo, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Managua, Nicaragua

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Evangelista a Spinaceto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1926Born
10 Aug 195832.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 Jan 196841.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
18 Jan 196841.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Putia in Byzacena
31 Mar 196842.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Putia in Byzacena
16 Feb 197044.0AppointedArchbishop of Managua, Nicaragua
4 Apr 197044.1InstalledArchbishop of Managua, Nicaragua
25 May 198559.3Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198559.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Evangelista a Spinaceto
1 Apr 200579.1RetiredArchbishop of Managua, Nicaragua
3 Jun 201892.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Managua, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Miguel Obando Bravo
Miguel Cardinal Obando Bravo S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Managua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Libertad (Chontales)

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 50.1 years
  • a cardinal for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 3 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Jun 2018

Quantcast