Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Solórzano Pérez

Bishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1961 BornSan Andrés de la Palanca
29 Mar 198524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Managua, Nicaragua
17 Jun 200039.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Managua, Nicaragua
17 Jun 200039.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Theuzi
13 Jul 200039.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theuzi
15 Oct 200544.6AppointedBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
3 Dec 200544.7InstalledBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
11 Mar 201049.0AppointedBishop of Granada, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Jorge Solórzano Pérez:
Bishop Jorge Solórzano Pérez (born ) Bishop of Granada

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Granada.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2005
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,807

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013