Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Lisímaco de Jesús Vílchez Vílchez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jinotega


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1929BornJinotega
6 Feb 195525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
18 Jun 198253.0AppointedPrelate of Jinotega, Nicaragua
19 Jul 198455.1AppointedPrelate of Jinotega, Nicaragua
8 Sep 198455.3Ordained BishopPrelate of Jinotega, Nicaragua
30 Apr 199161.9AppointedBishop of Jinotega, Nicaragua
10 May 200575.9RetiredBishop of Jinotega, Nicaragua
19 Feb 201383.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Jinotega, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Pedro Lisímaco de Jesús Vílchez Vílchez:
Bishop Pedro Lisímaco de Jesús Vílchez Vílchez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jinotega

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 19 Feb 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015