Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Taffi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Nicaragua

Titular Archbishop of Sergiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1897Born
19 Feb 192123.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 194749.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cuba
14 May 194749.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sergiopolis
14 May 194749.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Puerto Rico
8 Jun 194749.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sergiopolis
9 Jan 195052.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
9 Jan 195052.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
1958²60.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
1958²60.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
6 Jan 197072.0DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Nicaragua

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Taffi
Archbishop Antonio Taffi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Nicaragua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFarnese, Diocese of Acquapendente, Italy

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 52
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 107, and Page 108, and Page 147
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 182

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast