Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos José Santi Brugia, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1921Born
16 Apr 194625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
18 Jun 198261.2AppointedBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
31 Jul 198261.3Ordained BishopBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
15 May 199170.1DiedBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Carlos José Santi Brugia
Bishop Carlos José Santi Brugia O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Matagalpa

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast