Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Franck Nzika

Bishop of Impfondo, Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1971 Born
9 Dec 200029.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ouesso, Congo
12 Dec 201948.8AppointedBishop of Impfondo, Congo
1 Mar 202049.0Ordained BishopBishop of Impfondo, Congo

MicroData Summary for Daniel Franck Nzika
Bishop Daniel Franck Nzika (born ) Bishop of Impfondo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOuesso, Diocese of Ouesso
Ordained BishopEsplanade, Saint-Paul, Cathedral, Impfondo, Diocese of Impfondo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Impfondo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2019
  • ob: CB, 26 Jan 2020
  • mn/ob: CB, 29 Feb 2020
  • c2+: CB, 1 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast