Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aldo Giordano

Apostolic Nuncio to Venezuela

Titular Archbishop of Tamada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1954 Born
28 Jul 197924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cuneo, Italy
7 Jun 200853.7AppointedPermanent Observer to Council of Europe
26 Oct 201359.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamada
26 Oct 201359.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
14 Dec 201359.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamada

MicroData Summary for Aldo Giordano
Archbishop Aldo Giordano (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuneo, Diocese of Cuneo, Italy
Ordained BishopPalazzetto dello Sport di San Rocco Castagnaretta, Cuneo, Diocese of Cuneo, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Venezuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Oct 2013
  • ob: CB, 6 Nov 2013
  • c2: CB, 8 Nov 2013
  • c34: CB, 6 Dec 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 160
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,993

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 10 Oct 2019

Quantcast