Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Willem Maria Bluyssen (Bluijssen)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1926BornNijmegen
3 Jun 195024.1Ordained PriestPriest of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
28 Oct 196135.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
28 Oct 196135.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aëtus
27 Dec 196135.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aëtus
11 Oct 196640.5AppointedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
1 Mar 198457.9ResignedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
8 Aug 201387.3DiedBishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johannes Willem Maria Bluyssen (Bluijssen):
Bishop Johannes Willem Maria Bluyssen (Bluijssen) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 51.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB, 8 Aug 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013