Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubertus Cornelis Antonius Ernst

Bishop Emeritus of Breda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1917 BornBreda
7 Jun 194124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Breda, Netherlands
3 Nov 196750.6AppointedBishop of Breda, Netherlands
17 Dec 196750.7Ordained BishopBishop of Breda, Netherlands
6 May 199275.1RetiredBishop of Breda, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Hubertus Cornelis Antonius Ernst:
Bishop Hubertus Cornelis Antonius Ernst (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Breda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Breda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Nov 2013