Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf Joseph Manfred Staverman, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Djajapura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1915BornAmsterdam, Netherlands
3 Mar 194024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Apr 195641.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hollandia, Indonesia
29 Apr 195641.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
12 Sep 195641.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
15 Nov 196651.6AppointedBishop of Sukarnapura, Indonesia
6 May 197257.1ResignedBishop of Djajapura, Indonesia
18 Oct 199075.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Djajapura, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Joseph Manfred Staverman:
Bishop Rudolf Joseph Manfred Staverman O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Djajapura

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Jan 2014