Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gerardo Miguel Nieves Loja

Coadjutor Bishop-Elect of Riobamba, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1963 Born
12 Dec 199330.4Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
1996¹32.5IncardinatedPriest of Riobamba, Ecuador
27 Oct 202057.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Riobamba, Ecuador
16 Jan 202157.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Riobamba, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Miguel Nieves Loja
Father Gerardo Miguel Nieves Loja (born ) Coadjutor Bishop-Elect of Riobamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Valle, Archdiocese of Cuenca

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Riobamba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2020
  • ob: CB, 30 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast