Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Riobamba

Dioecesis Rivibambensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 25 August 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Quito
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ecuador
  • Square Kilometers: 7,014 (2,709 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Apartado 06-01-36, Calle Espejo 2253, Riobamba, Ecuador
  • Telephone: (03)296.00.48/9
  • Fax: 296.98.34

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Bolivar
29 December 1862ErectedDiocese of Cuenca Diocese of Bolivar (erected)
Diocese of Riobamba
25 August 1955Name ChangedDiocese of Bolivar Diocese of Riobamba
29 December 1957Territory LostDiocese of Riobamba Diocese of Guaranda (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bolivar
1950373,000374,00099.7%5440943,9683814040ap1951
Diocese of Riobamba
1964304,000304,20099.9%5537923,3045221938ap1967
1968352,283.0%60319106021638ap1971
1976400,000400,000100.0%404010,0001914341ap1977
1980417,000457,00091.2%44449,477712545ap1981
1990562,000607,00092.6%38155310,6031716546ap1991
1999360,000400,00090.0%4122635,71432920048ap2000
2000280,000422,67666.2%4126674,17943322052ap2001
2001330,000500,00066.0%4027674,92543418452ap2002
2002330,000500,00066.0%4027674,9253418452ap2003
2003330,000403,18581.8%4027674,92553418452ap2004
2004330,000403,18581.8%4027674,92553418452ap2005
2010399,000510,00078.2%5227795,05073418456ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 18 Jun 2013