Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placidus Gervasius Nkalanga, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bukoba, Tanzania

Member of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1919Born
15 Jul 195031.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 196141.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bukoba, Tanzania
18 Apr 196141.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Balbura
21 May 196141.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Balbura
1966¹46.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kabale, Uganda
6 Mar 196949.7AppointedBishop of Bukoba, Tanzania
26 Nov 197354.4ResignedBishop of Bukoba, Tanzania
8 Dec 198465.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Dec 201596.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Bukoba, Tanzania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Placidus Gervasius Nkalanga
Bishop Placidus Gervasius Nkalanga O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bukoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRuti

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 54.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • prof: CB, 11 Oct 2012
  • d: CB, 21 Dec 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast