Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Clancy

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of British Guiana, Guyana

Titular Bishop of Oreus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1802BornCork, Ireland
24 May 182321.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 183432.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
30 Oct 183432.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Oreus
21 Dec 183432.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oreus
12 Apr 183735.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles
3 Sep 184341.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles
19 Jun 184745.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles

MicroData Summary for William Clancy
Bishop William Clancy (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of British Guiana

  • a priest for 24.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 134, and Page 292
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Aug 2016