Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Walsh

Deceased

Archbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1804BornWaterford, Ireland
182823.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 184237.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
15 Feb 184237.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina
1 May 184237.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina
27 Sep 184439.9SucceededBishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
4 May 185247.5AppointedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
10 Aug 185853.8DiedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for William Walsh:
Archbishop William Walsh (born , died ) Archbishop of Halifax

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 210, and Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013