Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Thomas Troy, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1739Born
26 Mar 175718.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
17 Apr 175718.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
16 Dec 177637.7AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
8 Jun 177738.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
19 Dec 178647.7AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
11 May 182384.1DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Thomas Troy (VIAF: 5740342)
Archbishop John Thomas Troy O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorterstown
Death PlaceUsher's Island, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Buried Place (Original)George's Hill, Chapel
Buried Place (Current)Marlborough Street

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 45.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 202, and Page 321
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 11
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 257, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 45, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 520, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 759, Ascendance
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 125
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast