Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Augustine Baines, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Sigus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1786Born
6 Sep 180418.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Apr 181023.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Feb 182336.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
4 Feb 182336.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sigus
1 May 182336.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sigus
3 Mar 182942.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
6 Jul 184357.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Peter Augustine Baines (VIAF: 20421751)
Bishop Peter Augustine Baines O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western District

EventPlace
Birth PlacePear Tree Farm, Kirkby, Liverpool, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Laurence, Abbey, Ampleforth, York, North Yorkshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained BishopLower Townsend Street, Dublin, County Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland
Death PlacePrior Park, Bath, Somerset, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England
Buried Place (Original)Prior Park, Bath, Somerset, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England
Buried Place (Current)St. Gregory, Abbey, Downside, Radstock, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 346
  • prof: Arundel to Zabi, Page 29
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 12
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 27 Jan 2018