Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Oliver O’Kelly

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1777²BornCurramore
1800²23.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 181437.7AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
12 Mar 181538.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
18 Apr 183457.2DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Oliver O’Kelly
Archbishop Oliver O’Kelly (born 1777, died ) Archbishop of Tuam

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 14
  • bd/bp/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 380

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016