Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Walsh

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1791BornLufany
1817¹25.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 184654.6AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
26 Jul 184654.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
11 Aug 187280.9DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Walsh:
Bishop Edward Walsh (born , died ) Bishop of Ossory

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • bp/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013