Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugene O’Connell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grass Valley, California

Titular Bishop of Ioppe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1815BornKingscourt, Ireland
21 May 184226.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 186045.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Marysville, USA
28 Sep 186045.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Flaviopolis
3 Feb 186145.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flaviopolis
3 Mar 186852.7AppointedBishop of Grass Valley, California, USA
29 Feb 188468.7ResignedBishop of Grass Valley, California, USA
29 Feb 188468.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
4 Dec 189176.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Grass Valley, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Eugene O’Connell:
Bishop Eugene O’Connell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grass Valley

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 272, and Page 323
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 580

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013