Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Kieran

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1803³Born
28 May 183127.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
1832¹28.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 186662.9AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
3 Feb 186763.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
15 Sep 186965.7DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Kieran
Archbishop Michael Kieran (born , died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArmagh, Archdiocese of Armagh
Ordained PriestNewry, County Down
Ordained BishopS. Malachie, Dundalk, Archdiocese of Armagh

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Feb 2017