Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Myles Murphy

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1787BornBallin, Oulart
1810²22.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
1811²23.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 182840.7AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
8 Sep 182841.0ResignedBishop-Elect of Ossory, Ireland
27 Nov 184962.2AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
10 Mar 185062.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
13 Aug 185668.9DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Myles Murphy
Bishop Myles Murphy (born , died ) Bishop of Ferns

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 269
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Jul 2016